Al-Serehi, Amal Ateegallah Hamed (CPSO#: 83286)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008