Al-Shamsi, Humaid Obaid (CPSO#: 86148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University College, Cork, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tawam Hospital
The Department of Oncology
Al-Ain
AlAin 00000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +97137677444
Fax: (888) 301-1432
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-0788
Fax: (905) 897-9229
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUMAID OBAID AL-SHAMSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2007 to 26 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011