Al-Sheef, Mohammed Abdullah Ali (CPSO#: 89681)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 09 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010