Al-Shimmiri, Majed Mohammad (CPSO#: 63035)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Jan 1997
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1996