Al-Shoaibi, Naeem Abdulmonem Obeedallah (CPSO#: 82393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8191 IBN SENAN STREET
JEDDAH 23456
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966555631771

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAEEM ABDULMONEM OBEEDALLAH AL-SHOAIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHOAIBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2005 to 12 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2006 to 12 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017