Al-Sulaiti, Ghada Jaber Ahmed A K (CPSO#: 80313)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Oct 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Jordan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2003 to 19 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2004 to 19 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2005