Al-Tai, Saqar Hamed Issa (CPSO#: 77559)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dundee, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2003