Al-Tamimi, Nehal Ramadan Abdullah (CPSO#: 73271)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Feb 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 1999 to 15 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2000 to 15 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2001