Al-Tarshi, Muna Talib Ali (CPSO#: 94333)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 06 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 06 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2012