Al-Watban, Lemmese Farouk A (CPSO#: 92080)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Apr 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014