Al-Zahrani, Turky Mohammed Saeed (CPSO#: 75890)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Feb 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2002 to 05 Feb 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2003 to 05 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2004