Al-Zahrani, Zeyad Ahmed Ali (CPSO#: 78537)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 12 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Sep 2003 to 12 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Sep 2004