Alabduljalil, Talal M A A (CPSO#: 88250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait
USA - Oregon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALAL M A A ALABDULJALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALABDULJALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013