Alabdulrazzaq, Dalia M Y M (CPSO#: 82750)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 08 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011