Aladamawi, Somayyah Abdulhadi O (CPSO#: 112976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 26 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Ottawa
451 Smyth Road, Room 2044
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M5
Phone: (613) 562-5460
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOMAYYAH ABDULHADI O ALADAMAWI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALADAMAWI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. ALADAMAWI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALADAMAWI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALADAMAWI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALADAMAWI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALADAMAWI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Aug 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019