Aladsani, Ahmed Abdullah Ahmed (CPSO#: 92195)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Nov 2009 to 20 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 21 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011