Alam, Muhammad Mumtaz (CPSO#: 93986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: 519-646-6100
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. M. Alam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alam ( CPSO# 93986 )

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD MUMTAZ ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2012