Alameldin, Mona (CPSO#: 96773)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Nov 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2014