Alami Laroussi, Nassiba (CPSO#: 92563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
409-1371 Neilson Rd
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: 4162829198
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 08 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASSIBA ALAMI LAROUSSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAMI LAROUSSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2017