Alammadi, Rana Ali Abbas Ahmed (CPSO#: 85609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 17 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 17 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Sep 2007