Alammari, Adel Ahmed Omar (CPSO#: 92215)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 07 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011