Alanazi, Mosleh Nazzal Jaber Alabdly (CPSO#: 71874)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 05 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 05 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 1999 to 05 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2001 to 05 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2003