Alanjari, Abdulmohsen KH A A (CPSO#: 90473)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012