Alanzi, Fawaz Abdullah H. (CPSO#: 98980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2018

Expiry Date:  07 Jun 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2014 to 17 Aug 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 18 Aug 2014 to 14 Sep 2014
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 07 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Fawaz  Abdullah  H.  Alanzi  may  practise  paediatrics  at McMaster
                  Children's   Hospital  in  Hamilton,  Ontario,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Alanzi's  eligibility  to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Alanzi's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Alanzi's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on June 8, 2018, and will expire  on or before
                  June 7, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.