Alaqeel, Meshal Khaled A (CPSO#: 92239)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011