Alarakhia, Rehana (CPSO#: 92824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Easton Drive
Selkirk MB  R1A 2M2
Phone: (204) 482-5800
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

HSC Hospital
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A1R9
Canada
Phone: (204) 787-3661
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHANA ALARAKHIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALARAKHIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jun 2010 to 16 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010