Alasiri, Rahaf Mohammed A (CPSO#: 94972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 19 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416 323 6400
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAHAF MOHAMMED A ALASIRI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALASIRI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ALASIRI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALASIRI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALASIRI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALASIRI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALASIRI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019