Alassaf, Hossam Abdullah M (CPSO#: 94956)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Qassim University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2017