Alavi, Afsaneh (CPSO#: 83058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:KERMAN UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 312
250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 883-7997
Fax: (905) 883-7994
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wound Care Centre
Womens College Hospital
5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6407
Fax: (416) 323-6215
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Afsaneh Alavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alavi ( CPSO# 83058 )

Business Address:
312 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 883-7997

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Womens College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6407

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFSANEH ALAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 27 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011