Alavi Tabari, Nazanin (CPSO#: 95224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction And Mental
Health (CAMH)
100 Stokes Street
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34255
Fax: (416) 979-6864
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAZANIN ALAVI TABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVI TABARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2016