Alavian Ghavanini, Ahmad (CPSO#: 87003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Shiraz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: (905) 813-4229
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

404 - 130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Canada
Phone: 905-232-6556
Fax: 905-232-6557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmad Alavian Ghavanini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alavian Ghavanini ( CPSO# 87003 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
EMG Lab
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4545

Business Address:
404 - 130 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L5A 3V8
Phone Number: (905) 232-6556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD ALAVIAN GHAVANINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVIAN GHAVANINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012