Alazhari, Khalid Elhadi Ali (CPSO#: 92262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1H 3B7
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-3533
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 ellesmere RD
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 2848131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alazhari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alazhari ( CPSO# 92262 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131


Corporation Name: Alazhari Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID ELHADI ALI ALAZHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAZHARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2009