Albakistani, Abdulghani Maulawiahmed Mubarak (CPSO#: 80122)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PEAP - Resident - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008