Albakistani, Reem Hameedalhaqq A (CPSO#: 110342)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 21 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018