Albrecht, Gaylord Dale (CPSO#: 86432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 763-4315
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.D. Albrecht Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Albrecht ( CPSO# 86432 )

Business Address:
Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYLORD DALE ALBRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBRECHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2010