Albus, Wayne William (CPSO#: 57125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 talbot st s
Essex ON  N8M 1B7
Phone: (519) 961-9436
Fax: (519) 961-9728
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Albus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Albus ( CPSO# 57125 )

Business Address:
109 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-8310

Business Address:
Essex Evening Walk-In Clinic
169 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 961-9436

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE WILLIAM ALBUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALBUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 11, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)