Aldakkan, Abdulrahman Saad A (CPSO#: 95054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Divison of Neurosurgery
30 Bond St, Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN SAAD A ALDAKKAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDAKKAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2018