Aldosary, Fahad Abdullah Bakheet (CPSO#: 76339)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2009