Alegado, Eli (CPSO#: 67460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog, Visayan

Education:Ateneo De Davao University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L6
Phone: (647) 349-1270
Fax: (647) 349-1271
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3932 B Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-2111
Fax: (416) 630-7843
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eli Alegado Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Alegado ( CPSO# 67460 )

Business Address:
Unit 19
1415 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L6
Phone Number: (647) 349-1270

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Maryland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELI ALEGADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEGADO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2005