Alenezi, Shuliweeh Menwer R (CPSO#: 92628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3767
Fax: (613) 738-4832
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Alenezi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alenezi ( CPSO# 92628 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
410 Smyth Road
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHULIWEEH MENWER R ALENEZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALENEZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2010 to 18 Jun 2010
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015