Alewan, Salem Omran Ahmed (CPSO#: 97144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Salem Alewan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Alewan ( CPSO# 97144 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (204) 510-2131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEM OMRAN AHMED ALEWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 28 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018