Alexander, Robert Todd (CPSO#: 77886)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007