Alexandre, Maria Teresa Silva Torres Almeida (CPSO#: 95001)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lisboa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2011 to 14 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 May 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2011