Alghamdi, Ahmed Saeed Dammas (CPSO#: 71835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72-VICTORIA AVENUE
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Phone: (519) 397-0790
Fax: (519)397-5535
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alghamdi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alghamdi ( CPSO# 71835 )

Business Address:
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Phone Number: (519) 397-0790

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMED SAEED DAMMAS ALGHAMDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALGHAMDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 16 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 16 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 16 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012