Alghamdi, Mohammed Ali Hajis (CPSO#: 90056)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2015