Alharbi, Faiz Mosa F (CPSO#: 85542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: Al Hrbi, Faiz Mosa F (used until: 27 Feb 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lense ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 16 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAIZ MOSA F ALHARBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHARBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Aug 2006 to 23 Oct 2006
PEAP - Resident - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2006 to 23 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2007 to 23 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2008 to 23 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2009 to 23 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2010 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 24 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2013