Alhatmy, Alanoud Youssef H (CPSO#: 108665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANOUD YOUSSEF H ALHATMY may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ALHATMY is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALHATMY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALHATMY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALHATMY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ALHATMY ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ALHATMY ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 05 Apr 2016 to 18 Apr 2016
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 19 Apr 2016 to 02 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018