Alhazmi, Areej Ibrahim Saleem (CPSO#: 90295)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2009 to 25 May 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 01 Mar 2010
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 03 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Mar 2011 to 03 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Mar 2012 to 02 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Sep 2016 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2017 to 28 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2017