Alhendi, Alaa Abdulaziz A (CPSO#: 99163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAA ABDULAZIZ A ALHENDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALHENDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 23 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Jul 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2015 to 13 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2014