Alhoulei-Alsuwaidi, Ali Saeed Ali (CPSO#: 74246)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 18 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2000 to 18 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2001 to 18 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2002 to 18 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2005